KS SB122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing medicaid and educational services for foster care youth and certain former foster care youth.
Title
Implementing medicaid and educational services for foster care youth and certain former foster care youth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb122/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb122_00_0000.pdf |