KS SB123 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for approved nonprofit sponsor of summer food service program.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for approved nonprofit sponsor of summer food service program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELED |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |