KS SB125 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 125 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Amending the Kansas pet animal act.
Title
House Substitute for SB 125 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Amending the Kansas pet animal act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2016-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 346S |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 12, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |