KS SB125 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing compensation to a person who was wrongfully convicted; providing compensation to the heirs of a person who was wrongfully executed.
Title
Providing compensation to a person who was wrongfully convicted; providing compensation to the heirs of a person who was wrongfully executed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb125/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb125_00_0000.pdf |