KS SB131 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 131 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice - Relating to peer support counseling sessions; confidentiality of communications.
Title
Substitute for SB 131 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice - Relating to peer support counseling sessions; confidentiality of communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2015-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 152S |
2015-03-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-03-12 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |