KS SB138 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
KPERS working after retirement; exempting licensed school retirants from earnings limitation; sunsetting special exemptions; waiting period.
Title
KPERS working after retirement; exempting licensed school retirants from earnings limitation; sunsetting special exemptions; waiting period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2017-04-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was withdrawn |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Longbine |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |