KS SB141 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion; prohibiting abortions performed solely because of the gender of the unborn child.
Title
Abortion; prohibiting abortions performed solely because of the gender of the unborn child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected - Yea: 7 Nay: 33 (Y: 7 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was rejected - Yea: 12 Nay: 28 (Y: 12 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected - Yea: 7 Nay: 33 (Y: 7 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was rejected - Yea: 12 Nay: 28 (Y: 12 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Calendar and Printing |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2013-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 2 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected Yea: 7 Nay: 33 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was rejected Yea: 12 Nay: 28 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 11, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |