KS SB146 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Continuation of 20 mill statewide levy for schools and property tax exemption of certain portion of property used for residential purposes from such levy.
Title
Continuation of 20 mill statewide levy for schools and property tax exemption of certain portion of property used for residential purposes from such levy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2017-05-10 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, May 10, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-04-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-04-06 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |