KS SB147 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas income tax act; providing changes in rates, itemized deductions, and determination of Kansas adjusted gross income and sunsetting certain modifications.
Title
Kansas income tax act; providing changes in rates, itemized deductions, and determination of Kansas adjusted gross income and sunsetting certain modifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report, be amended without recommendation by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 06, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |