KS SB157 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas highway patrol; immigration agreement.
Title
Kansas highway patrol; immigration agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb157/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb157_00_0000.pdf |