KS SB17 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring class M driver's licenses when operating a motorcycle registered under a temporary permit.
Title
Requiring class M driver's licenses when operating a motorcycle registered under a temporary permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 101 Nay: 22 (Y: 101 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 20, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 101 Nay: 22 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2019-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |