KS SB173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 173 by Committee on Appropriations - Providing for the Eisenhower legacy transportation plan.
Title
House Substitute for SB 173 by Committee on Appropriations - Providing for the Eisenhower legacy transportation plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 112 Nay: 3 (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 103 Nay: 16 (Y: 103 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 112 Nay: 3 (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 103 Nay: 16 (Y: 103 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 2, 2020 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 24, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 2 |
2020-03-19 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 112 Nay: 3 |
2020-03-19 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2020-03-17 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Proehl and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as conferees |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator McGinn , Senator Billinger and Senator Hawk as conferees |
2020-03-16 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 103 Nay: 16 |
2020-03-16 | House | House Amendment by Representative Benson was rejected |
2020-03-16 | House | House Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Benson |
2020-03-16 | House | House Representative Waymaster raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2020-03-16 | House | House Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2020-03-16 | House | House Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected |
2020-03-16 | House | House Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward |
2020-03-16 | House | House Motion to Amend - Amendment by Representative Francis was adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | House Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Francis |
2020-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-14 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |