KS SB178 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for nonprofit integrated community care organizations, and requiring the repeal or suspension of existing sales tax exemption when implementing any new exemption.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for nonprofit integrated community care organizations, and requiring the repeal or suspension of existing sales tax exemption when implementing any new exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 3:00 PM Room 582-N |
2019-03-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-03-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Suellentrop |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |