KS SB179 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the married tax filer income threshold for the subtraction modification for social security income.
Title
Increasing the married tax filer income threshold for the subtraction modification for social security income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb179/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb179_00_0000.pdf |