KS SB19 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain entities to access a criminal defendant's presentence investigation report.
Title
Authorizing certain entities to access a criminal defendant's presentence investigation report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |