KS SB192 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the secretary of transportation to designate toll projects on new and existing highways and changing the requirement to fully fund toll projects solely through toll revenue.
Title
Authorizing the secretary of transportation to designate toll projects on new and existing highways and changing the requirement to fully fund toll projects solely through toll revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb192/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb192_00_0000.pdf |