KS SB204 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the legislative post audit economic development incentive review subcommittee.
Title
Establishing the legislative post audit economic development incentive review subcommittee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELED |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb204/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb204_00_0000.pdf |