KS SB205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the duties of the administrator of the Kansas charitable gaming act.
Title
Clarifying the duties of the administrator of the Kansas charitable gaming act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |