KS SB210 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - House Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing KPERS membership to certain direct support positions in community developmental disability organizations upon completion of a two-year training period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing KPERS membership to certain direct support positions in community developmental disability organizations upon completion of a two-year training period.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-26HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-26SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-21SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-20SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback