KS SB212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Kansas victim information and notification everyday (VINE) coordinator within the office of the attorney general.
Title
Creating a Kansas victim information and notification everyday (VINE) coordinator within the office of the attorney general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb212/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb212_00_0000.pdf |