KS SB214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain exceptions to the confidentiality of state child death review board documents.
Title
Allowing certain exceptions to the confidentiality of state child death review board documents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb214/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb214_00_0000.pdf |