KS SB221 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the revised Kansas code for care of children and the newborn infant protection act and amending certain powers and duties of the secretary for children and families.
Title
Amending the revised Kansas code for care of children and the newborn infant protection act and amending certain powers and duties of the secretary for children and families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 546-S |
2018-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 5 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 16, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |