KS SB228 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending license and renewal application fees for insurance third party administrators.
Title
Amending license and renewal application fees for insurance third party administrators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 9, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N - CANCELED |
2019-04-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2019-04-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |