KS SB23 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, June 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, June 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Consolidating criminal prosecutions for fraud and abuse under the jurisdiction of the attorney general and establishing the office of the securities commissioner as a division under the jurisdiction of the commissioner of insurance.
Title
Consolidating criminal prosecutions for fraud and abuse under the jurisdiction of the attorney general and establishing the office of the securities commissioner as a division under the jurisdiction of the commissioner of insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 30 Nay: 8 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 2 (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 9 (Y: 115 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 2 (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 9 (Y: 115 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, June 1, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 30 Nay: 8 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-12 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 2 |
2017-05-12 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-12 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2017-04-06 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Patton and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers as conferees |
2017-04-06 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 115 Nay: 9 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was rejected |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 29, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 582-N |
2017-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Insurance; Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-03-24 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 28 Nay: 12 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |