KS SB230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the authority of the Kansas commission for the deaf and hard of hearing.
Title
Clarifying the authority of the Kansas commission for the deaf and hard of hearing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 3 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2020-03-11 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 3 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |