KS SB242 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax abatement for agricultural improvement destroyed or substantially destroyed by a natural disaster.
Title
Property tax abatement for agricultural improvement destroyed or substantially destroyed by a natural disaster.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Holland [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, October 29, 2019 |