KS SB25 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - House Motion to override line item vetoes prevailed. Yea: 86 Nay: 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - House Motion to override line item vetoes prevailed. Yea: 86 Nay: 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 25 by Committee on Appropriations - Appropriations for FY 2019, FY 2020, FY 2021 and FY 2022 for various state agencies.
Title
House Substitute for SB 25 by Committee on Appropriations - Appropriations for FY 2019, FY 2020, FY 2021 and FY 2022 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Motion to override line item vetoes prevailed. - Yea: 86 Nay: 30 (Y: 86 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Motion to override line item vetoes prevailed. - Yea: 27 Nay: 11 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 79 Nay: 45 (Y: 79 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 42 Nay: 81 (Y: 42 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as second conferees - Yea: 63 Nay: 61 (Y: 63 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 99 Nay: 25 (Y: 99 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Motion to override line item vetoes prevailed. - Yea: 27 Nay: 11 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 79 Nay: 45 (Y: 79 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 42 Nay: 81 (Y: 42 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as second conferees - Yea: 63 Nay: 61 (Y: 63 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 99 Nay: 25 (Y: 99 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | House Motion to override line item vetoes prevailed. Yea: 86 Nay: 30 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to override line item vetoes prevailed. Yea: 27 Nay: 11 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor except line item veto of Section 27(a) and (b), Section 56(e), Section 84(a), and Section 90(a) on Monday, May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 10, 2019 |
2019-05-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 14 |
2019-05-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2019-05-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 79 Nay: 45 |
2019-05-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Billinger, Senator Denning and Senator Hawk appointed as fourth conferees |
2019-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as fourth conferees |
2019-05-03 | House | House Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2019-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 42 Nay: 81 |
2019-05-03 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger and Senator Hawk appointed as third conferees |
2019-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as third conferees |
2019-05-03 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger and Senator Hawk appointed as second conferees |
2019-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as second conferees Yea: 63 Nay: 61 |
2019-05-03 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator McGinn , Senator Billinger and Senator Hawk as conferees |
2019-03-27 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as conferees |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 99 Nay: 25 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2019-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |