KS SB282 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Updating substances included in schedules I, II and III of the uniform controlled substances act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating substances included in schedules I, II and III of the uniform controlled substances act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 3 (Y: 121 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Holscher was rejected - Yea: 54 Nay: 69 (Y: 54 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 0 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
2018-05-04SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2018
2018-04-26SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2018-04-26SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-06HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
2018-04-06HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2018-03-28HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Concannon and Representative Murnan appointed as conferees
2018-03-28SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator V. Schmidt , Senator Bollier and Senator Kelly as conferees
2018-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 3
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Holscher was rejected Yea: 54 Nay: 69
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Holscher
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Barker was rejected
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Barker
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-16HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
2018-03-08HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
2018-02-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2018-02-12HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-02-08SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 0
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2018-01-24SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
2018-01-17SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2018-01-16SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb282/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb282_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb282_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb282_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb282_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180208180515_746753/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180326121823_115264/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180327155201_638606/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180406135411_953695/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180426161344_980013/

Bill Comments

feedback