KS SB285 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 285 by Committee on Ways and Means - Establishing the joint legislative transportation task force for evaluation of the state highway fund and the state highway transportation system.
Title
Substitute for SB 285 by Committee on Ways and Means - Establishing the joint legislative transportation task force for evaluation of the state highway fund and the state highway transportation system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 5 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed - Yea: 9 Nay: 29 (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed - Yea: 9 Nay: 29 (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-12 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 33 Nay: 5 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Suellentrop |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed Yea: 9 Nay: 29 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |