KS SB300 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting substantial change to the Kansas medical assistance program without prior legislative approval.
Title
Prohibiting substantial change to the Kansas medical assistance program without prior legislative approval.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, January 31, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELLED |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |