KS SB307 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for SB 307 by Committee on Judiciary--Statute of limitations for sexually violent crimes when the victim is a child; lesser included crimes, felony murder; intimidation of a witness; time limitations for criminal trials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for SB 307 by Committee on Judiciary--Statute of limitations for sexually violent crimes when the victim is a child; lesser included crimes, felony murder; intimidation of a witness; time limitations for criminal trials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 0 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 113 Nay: 0 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-01 Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
2012-06-01 Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012
2012-05-19 Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 0
2012-05-19 Conference Committee Report was adopted;
2012-05-17 Motion to accede adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative Meier appointed as second conferees
2012-05-15 Conference committee report now available
2012-05-15 Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as second conferees
2012-05-15 Substitute motion to not adopt the Conference Committee Report and appoint a new Conference Committee.
2012-05-15 Motion to adopt Conference Committee Report
2012-05-15 Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2012-05-14 Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 113 Nay: 0
2012-05-14 Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2012-05-14 Conference committee report now available
2012-03-28 Motion to accede adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller appointed as conferees
2012-03-27 Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
2012-03-21 Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
2012-03-21 Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2012-03-21 Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2012-03-16 Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2012-02-29 Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2012-02-20 Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2012-02-17 Received and Introduced
2012-02-16 Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2012-02-15 Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2012-02-15 Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2012-02-13 Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-20 Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2012-01-20 Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-19 Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback