KS SB307 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 114 Nay: 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Substitute for SB 307 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Amendments to the Kansas amusement ride act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Substitute for SB 307 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Amendments to the Kansas amusement ride act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 114 Nay: 6 (Y: 114 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 113 Nay: 11 (Y: 113 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 0 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 114 Nay: 6
2018-04-06HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2018-03-29HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz appointed as conferees
2018-03-28SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Estes , Senator Billinger and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees
2018-03-28HouseHouse Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 113 Nay: 11
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was adopted
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pittman
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was rejected
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pittman
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whitmer was adopted
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whitmer
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2018-03-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-03-13HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S
2018-02-16HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-02-16HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-02-15SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 0
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Billinger was adopted
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Billinger
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-13SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-02-06SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 06, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2018-01-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-01-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback