KS SB315 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas state employee health care commission, increasing members; adding the chairpersons of the senate committee on ways and means, house committee on appropriations, senate committee on public health and welfare, and house committee on health and human services, or their designees; authorizing the members to elect the chairperson.
Title
Kansas state employee health care commission, increasing members; adding the chairpersons of the senate committee on ways and means, house committee on appropriations, senate committee on public health and welfare, and house committee on health and human services, or their designees; authorizing the members to elect the chairperson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb315/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb315_00_0000.pdf |