KS SB367 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales taxation treatment of certain cash rebates on sales or leases of new motor vehicles.
Title
Sales taxation treatment of certain cash rebates on sales or leases of new motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-03-29 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Senator Wagle raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bowers |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Faust-Goudeau was rejected |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Faust-Goudeau |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Senator Wagle raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |