KS SB372 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the definition of the term "possession" in the Kansas criminal code.
Title
Clarifying the definition of the term "possession" in the Kansas criminal code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb372/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb372_00_0000.pdf |