KS SB38 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the KanCare bridge to a healthy Kansas program.
Title
Establishing the KanCare bridge to a healthy Kansas program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 152-S |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |