KS SB394 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring transparency in state government contract decisions and other actions.
Title
Ensuring transparency in state government contract decisions and other actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was rejected - Yea: 58 Nay: 65 (Y: 58 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Powell was rejected - Yea: 41 Nay: 77 (Y: 41 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was adopted - Yea: 64 Nay: 59 (Y: 64 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was rejected - Yea: 58 Nay: 65 (Y: 58 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Powell was rejected - Yea: 41 Nay: 77 (Y: 41 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was adopted - Yea: 64 Nay: 59 (Y: 64 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 16, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 06, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-02 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was rejected Yea: 58 Nay: 65 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Motion to reconsider amendment by Representative Miller adopted. |
2018-03-29 | House | House Representative Esau raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whipple |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Powell was rejected Yea: 41 Nay: 77 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Representative Miller raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Powell |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was adopted Yea: 64 Nay: 59 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Representative Williams raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2018-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2018-03-02 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Elections |
2018-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator McGinn |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |