KS SB40 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removing expired warning provision for approach of an emergency vehicle traffic violation.
Title
Removing expired warning provision for approach of an emergency vehicle traffic violation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2019-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |