KS SB437 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting a sales tax exemption for sales of currency, certain coins or bullion.
Title
Enacting a sales tax exemption for sales of currency, certain coins or bullion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |