KS SB449 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the transfer upon death and providing for an income tax deduction for contributions to an ABLE account and conforming allowable expenses for 529 plans to federal law.
Title
Allowing the transfer upon death and providing for an income tax deduction for contributions to an ABLE account and conforming allowable expenses for 529 plans to federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Conference |
2018-05-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-04-30 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Phillips and Representative Sawyer appointed as conferees |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Tyson , Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland as conferees |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Mason was adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Mason |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2018-04-03 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, April 03, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-03-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-03-27 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 20, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |