KS SB49 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the secretary of wildlife, parks and tourism to establish fees for cabins operated by the department and camping permits at state parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the secretary of wildlife, parks and tourism to establish fees for cabins operated by the department and camping permits at state parks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture
2019-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 29 Nay: 11
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
2019-01-29SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-01-28SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback