KS SB52 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage interest rate cap increase.
Title
Mortgage interest rate cap increase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 2 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 02, 2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 2 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-03-21 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2013-02-27 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 07, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 152-S |
2013-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-02-14 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 546-E |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |