KS SB52 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 52 by Committee on Health and Human Services - Filling and refilling prescriptions.
Title
House Substitute for SB 52 by Committee on Health and Human Services - Filling and refilling prescriptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S |
2017-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |