KS SB53 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating certain emergency medical services-related statutes.
Title
Updating certain emergency medical services-related statutes.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Holland [D] | Sen. Larry Alley [R] | Sen. Molly Baumgardner [R] | Sen. Kevin Braun [R] |
Sen. Marci Francisco [D] | Sen. David Haley [D] | Sen. Julia Lynn [R] | Sen. Carolyn McGinn [R] |
Sen. Mary Ware [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 88 Nay: 36 (Y: 88 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 88 Nay: 36 (Y: 88 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 10, 2019 |
2019-05-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2019-05-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2019-05-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2019-05-04 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2019-05-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2019-04-05 | House | House Representative Ruiz, L. is appointed to replace Representative Clayton on the Conference Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Representative Clayton is appointed to replace Representative Ruiz, L. on the Conference Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Awerkamp and Representative Ruiz, L. appointed as conferees |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Estes , Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 88 Nay: 36 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |