KS SB60 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, June 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, June 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 60 by Committee on Agriculture - Extending the sunset of certain department of agriculture fees and allowing the secretary of agriculture to charge and collect a paper document processing fee.
Title
House Substitute for SB 60 by Committee on Agriculture - Extending the sunset of certain department of agriculture fees and allowing the secretary of agriculture to charge and collect a paper document processing fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 32 Nay: 7 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 107 Nay: 11 (Y: 107 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 94 Nay: 24 (Y: 94 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 107 Nay: 11 (Y: 107 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 94 Nay: 24 (Y: 94 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, June 7, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 7 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-18 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 107 Nay: 11 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2017-05-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree, not adopted |
2017-05-04 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2017-03-21 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hoffman, Representative Thompson and Representative Carlin appointed as conferees |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Kerschen , Senator Estes and Senator Francisco as conferees |
2017-03-20 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 94 Nay: 24 |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture |
2017-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 582-N |
2017-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 5 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |