KS SB61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending podiatrist qualifications and scope of practice.
Title
Amending podiatrist qualifications and scope of practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2019-03-18 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 11, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |