KS SB67 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Granting state-chartered banks the power to purchase certain tax credits.
Title
Granting state-chartered banks the power to purchase certain tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2017-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 2 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |