KS SB72 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations for FY 2019, FY 2020, FY 2021, FY 2022, FY 2023 and FY 2024 for various state agencies.
Title
Supplemental appropriations for FY 2019, FY 2020, FY 2021, FY 2022, FY 2023 and FY 2024 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb72/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb72_00_0000.pdf |