KS SB76 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Professional occupations; restrictions on fees and licensing requirements.
Title
Professional occupations; restrictions on fees and licensing requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |