KS SB94 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the health maintenance organization privilege fee and extending the medical assistance fee fund.
Title
Increasing the health maintenance organization privilege fee and extending the medical assistance fee fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, May 09, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELLED |
2017-03-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-17 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 13 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Billinger was rejected |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Billinger |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Billinger was adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Billinger |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 06, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |